Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 798 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18601 Week
» 71617 Month
» 191144 Year
» 3217997 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3508 |
25/04/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08393 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1979 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/04/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
03/1979 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
fA |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/04/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3508 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08393 |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
30/11/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|