Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2935 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16341 Week
» 69357 Month
» 188884 Year
» 3215737 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3504 |
17/04/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08389 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/04/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/04/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3504 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08389 |
|
|