Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1138 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18941 Week
» 71957 Month
» 191484 Year
» 3218337 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3489 |
03/04/1958 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
10 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
03/04/1958 to New England (34E) |
Withdrawn |
06/04/1968 |
Time in Service |
10 yrs , 3 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1968 |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/04/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
03/04/1958 |
Power Unit ER80857 |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/04/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3489 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
16/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3489 |
|
|
12/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|