Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1393 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19196 Week
» 72212 Month
» 191739 Year
» 3218592 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3481 |
24/02/1958 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/04/1960 |
|
VHF Radio fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/02/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
24/02/1958 |
Power Unit ER81851 |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
06/04/1960 |
08/04/1960 |
Non Classified VHF Radio VHF Radio fitted
|
|
|
|
3 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
26/10/1962 |
26/11/1962 |
General |
|
|
|
32 days |
|
28,958 |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/02/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3481 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
06/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
21/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
06/04/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 06/04/1960. Dep: 08/04/1960. Work undertaken: VHF Radio VHF Radio fitted
Modification: VHF Radio fitted |
|
|
26/10/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1962. Dep: 26/11/1962. |
|
|
01/12/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3481 |
|
|
05/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|