Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1325 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14731 Week
» 67747 Month
» 187274 Year
» 3214127 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D348 |
07/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40148 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3094/D644 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
07/06/1961 to Neville Hill (55H) |
Withdrawn |
04/08/1982 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys |
Cut Up |
07/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Bogies for 40012,power unit for 40074 |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
07/06/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
02/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
02/1978 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D348 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3094 Allocated to Neville Hill (55H) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40148 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
04/08/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40148 |
|
|
07/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|