Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1192 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18995 Week
» 72011 Month
» 191538 Year
» 3218391 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3468 |
12/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08383 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/08/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
12/08/1957 |
Power Unit IH3856 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3468 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08383 |
|
|
23/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
17/03/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08383 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
10/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|