Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 404 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18207 Week
» 71223 Month
» 190750 Year
» 3217603 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
35025 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Merchant Navy |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 11/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/09/1964 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys |
Total Mileage |
884,081 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
MN Series 3 |
3343 |
01/1949 |
SR |
6,000g |
5t 0cwt |
MN Series 3 |
3350 |
06/1952 |
SR |
6,000g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1956 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 35025 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/1949 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: MN Series 3 number 3343 |
|
|
20/09/1949 |
Naming |
Named 'BROCKLEBANK LINE' by Colonel D.H.Bates, Chairman of Brocklebank Line. at Waterloo Station |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
06/1952 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: MN Series 3 number 3350 |
|
|
18/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
15/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
12/1956 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 35025 |
|
|