Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 123 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17926 Week
» 70942 Month
» 190469 Year
» 3217322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C10 |
m/e |
08/1942 |
British Railways |
35010 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
18/12/1942 |
BLUE STAR |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Merchant Navy |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 08/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 11/09/1966 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,241,929 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
MN Series 1 |
3120 |
07/1942 |
SR |
5,000g |
5t 0cwt |
MN Series 2 |
3122 |
Unknown |
SR |
5,100g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1945 |
Original cab replaced with revised model |
01/1957 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1942 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: MN Series 1 number 3120 |
|
|
08/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C10 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
18/12/1942 |
Naming |
Named 'BLUE STAR' |
|
|
11/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 35010 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
27/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
01/1957 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D) |
|
|
06/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
11/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 35010 |
|
|