Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1010 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14416 Week
» 67432 Month
» 186959 Year
» 3213812 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C4 |
m/e |
10/1941 |
British Railways |
35004 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Merchant Navy |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 10/1941 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 31/10/1965 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy |
Total Mileage |
1,131,417 |
Information |
Rebuilt Eastleigh Jul 1958 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
MN Series 1 |
3114 |
10/1941 |
SR |
5,000g |
5t 0cwt |
MN Series 1 |
3113 |
01/1944 |
SR |
5,000g |
5t 0cwt |
MN Series 2 |
3121 |
10/1965 |
SR |
5,100g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1950 |
Original cab replaced with revised model |
07/1958 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1941 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C4 Built at Eastleigh Works Tender fitted: MN Series 1 |
|
|
01/01/1942 |
Naming |
Named 'CUNARD WHITE STAR' |
|
|
01/1944 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: MN Series 1 number 3113 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 35004 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Modification |
Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model |
|
|
01/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
07/1958 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
10/1965 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: MN Series 2 number 3121 |
|
|
31/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 35004 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: at Eastleigh Depot |
|
|