Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2300 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20103 Week
» 73119 Month
» 192646 Year
» 3219499 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
34100 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 2 |
3354 |
12/1949 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3282 |
08/11/1958 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
LOAN |
74B |
Ramsgate |
on |
12/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
74B |
Ramsgate |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
6w/e |
24/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
4w/e |
19/11/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/07/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1960 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops 49, 30352, 30416/54/99, 30501/35/89, 30580 (ex 3506), 698, 30744/51/69, 30864, 30936/56, 32094, 32347, 32608, 34025/9/54/9/61/7/96/7/8. For shops 34055, 35010. Ex shops 30766/72, 34100 (dark green), 30484 (lined black), 30571 (ex 3397), 30306. Scrap: 30122, 154, 408. Noted un-renumbered: 246, 1432. No. 769 had just been renumbered. |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 34100 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Ramsgate (RAM) Tender fitted: LP Series 2 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
08/11/1958 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3282 |
|
|
09/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (70E) |
|
|
02/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34100 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|