Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 3987 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17393 Week
» 70409 Month
» 189936 Year
» 3216789 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
34090 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 02/1949 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 09/07/1967 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys |
Information |
Rebuilt Eastleigh Aug 1960 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 2 |
3335 |
01/02/1949 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3269 |
01/1959 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1960 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/03/1952 |
Eastleigh Works |
34090 is recently out of Eastleigh painted dark green with the rather large name plates moved higher up on the boiler casing sides. The appearance of the engine is certainly improved. |
SLS/195206 |
12/08/1967 |
Salisbury MPD |
On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 34090 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/02/1949 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3335 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
01/1959 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3269 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34090 |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|