20/04/1947 |
Brighton Yard |
21C158-9 were in Brighton yard and 21C160 was finished on, 20/4. |
SLS/194706 |
16/01/1948 |
Waterloo Station |
'Battle of Britain' 'Pacific' Sir Frederick Pile was officially inspected here on 16/1, being painted in standard S.R. livery, numbered S21C158 and with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tender. The crest to be used between the words 'British' and 'Railways' had not yet been put on |
SLS/194803 |
10/04/1965 |
Locomotives Stored at Barry (In sidings at Barry Docks) |
In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 2873, 3612, 3845, 4253, 4270, 4561, 4566, 4588, 5193, 5227, 5521, 5526, 5532, 5538, 5539, 5541, 5542, 5552, 5553, 5557, 5558, 5570, 5572, 5651, 5794, 5814, 5952, 6023, 6024, 6115, 7229, 7722, 7903, 8419, 9462, 9468, 9629, 30541, 30830, 34016, 34027, 34028, 34058, 34067, 34070, 34072, 34073, 34081, 34092, 34105, 35006, 35009, 35018, 35025, 92207, 92245. Behind Barry Works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4277, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5619, 5637, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6692, 6695, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31618, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 45690, 48431, 53808, 53809. |
SLS/196505 |
05/09/1965 |
Locomotives Stored at Barry (In sidings at Barry Docks) |
In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 4156, 5526, 6024, 34067, 44123, 2873, 4157, 5532, 7229, 34070, 44422, 3612, 4160, 5538, 7903, 34072, 45699, 3814, 4253, 5539, 9629, 34073, 3845, 4270, 5541, 34081, 80067, 3862, 4561, 5542, 30541, 34092, 92207, 4110, 4566, 5552, 30830, 34105, 92245, 4115, 4588, 5553, 34016, 35006, 4121, 5193, 5572, 34027, 35009, 4144, 5227, 5952, 34028, 35018, 4150, 5521, 6023, 34058, 35025; Behind Barry Works: 2807, 4930, 5199, 6619, 30499, 45690, 2857, 4936, 5224, 6634, 30506, 48431, 2861, 4942, 5239, 6686, 30825, 53808, 2874, 4953, 5322, 6695, 30828, 53809, 2885, 4979, 5619, 6960, 30841, 31625, 3803, 4983, 5637, 6989, 30847, 31638, 3822, 5029, 5643, 7027, 31618, 4141, 5043, 5668, 7200, 31806, 4247, 5051, 5900, 7202, 31874, 4248, 5080, 5967, 7325, 4277, 5164, 5972, 9466. |
SLS/196510 |
06/02/1966 |
Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry |
5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. |
SLS/196603 |
07/07/1968 |
Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks |
Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. |
SLS/196810 |