Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1011 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14417 Week
» 67433 Month
» 186960 Year
» 3213813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C144 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
34044 |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 21/05/1967 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys |
Information |
Rebuilt Eastleigh May 1960 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 1 |
3260 |
22/10/1946 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3297 |
04/11/1948 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3261 |
01/04/1949 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3309 |
15/05/1956 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 2 |
3336 |
07/05/1960 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1960 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
ex Works: Blue, 35017/26/28; dark green, 30752, 30858, 34009/17/26/44/51/53/88/89; lined black, 30050, 30117/28, 30285/8, 30482, 30707/58 Lord St. Levan, 30909/28. B.4 dock tanks 30096/102 have lost their names on repainting. No. 32425 has been repaired here, also 32151 (lined black), 32331/7, 32558. The I.3 tank, 32076, appears to be waiting scrap. |
SLS/195103 |
28/10/1959 |
Eastleigh Works (ex-Works) |
On Works:- 30028/505/14/38/803/64, 32650/4037/83, 35013/6/25/6/8, 41314/2081, 73028/84, 84021/3, E5005, 20003. Waiting works:- 30055/104/783, 34026/62/6, 35012/5, 42076, 75079; ex-Works:- 30667, 30844, 34044, 35014. |
SLS/195912 |
16/10/1967 |
Cashmore\'s, Newport (Mon.) |
Dumped locomotives: 34016, 34044, 35012, 73022. |
SLS/196712 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C144, name: WOOLACOMBE Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
22/10/1946 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3260 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
04/11/1948 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3297 |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 34044 |
|
|
01/04/1949 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3261 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
15/05/1956 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3309 |
|
|
05/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3336 |
|
|
21/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34044 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|