|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 16/03/1953 | 23/04/1953 | 39 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 14/10/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 31 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 14/06/1956 | 14/07/1956 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 04/11/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 34 days | General | Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
Eastleigh Works | 19/05/1959 | 06/06/1959 | 19 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 28/12/1960 | 28/01/1961 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 09/04/1963 | 18/05/1963 | 40 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | General | 'West Country' Class Nos. 21C122 and 21C123 have been noted carrying their names, Exmoor and Blackmoor Vale respectively. No. 21C119 has been converted to burn oil fuel; also several 2-6-0's, at least two of which have been equipped and tested at Ashford. | SLS/194710 |
12/05/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1946 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 21C122, name: EXMOOR Built at Brighton Works |
||
25/01/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3278 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) | ||
01/08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34022 | ||
04/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
16/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1953. Dep: 23/04/1953. | ||
14/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/10/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954. | ||
14/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/06/1956. Dep: 14/07/1956. | ||
04/11/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3331 | ||
04/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
14/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
19/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/05/1959. Dep: 06/06/1959. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
28/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/12/1960. Dep: 28/01/1961. | ||
26/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
11/07/1962 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3332 | ||
09/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/04/1963. Dep: 18/05/1963. | ||
25/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34022 | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |