|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 08/06/1953 | 10/07/1953 | 33 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 25/11/1954 | 24/12/1954 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 25/05/1956 | 16/06/1956 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 19/11/1957 | 24/12/1957 | 36 days | General | Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
Eastleigh Works | 02/06/1959 | 13/06/1959 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 27/01/1961 | 25/02/1961 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 12/03/1963 | 13/03/1963 | 2 days | Non Classified | |||
Eastleigh Works | 19/08/1963 | 19/10/1963 | 62 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 29/11/1965 | 03/12/1965 | 5 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/05/1950 | Brighton Works | Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. | SLS/195006 |
07/09/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. | SLS/196310 |
12/08/1967 | Salisbury MPD | On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. | SLS/196709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1946 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 21C121, name: DARTMOOR Built at Brighton Works |
||
18/01/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3277 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
01/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (PLY) | ||
01/08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34021 | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
08/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
08/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1953. Dep: 10/07/1953. | ||
25/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/11/1954. Dep: 24/12/1954. | ||
25/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/05/1956. Dep: 16/06/1956. | ||
19/11/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3322 | ||
19/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1957. Dep: 24/12/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
14/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
02/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1959. Dep: 13/06/1959. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
27/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/01/1961. Dep: 25/02/1961. | ||
10/02/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) | ||
24/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
12/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 12/03/1963. Dep: 13/03/1963. | ||
19/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1963. Dep: 19/10/1963. | ||
18/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
29/11/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/11/1965. Dep: 03/12/1965. | ||
09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34021 | ||
03/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |