28/02/1946 |
\"West Country\" Namings |
21C107 is 'Wadebridge,' 21C108 'Padstow' (correcting any previous reports). The name 'Bodmin' may not actually be on 21C110 yet. Names on 21C101-4, 21C106-9, 21C112 officially confirmed 14/3/46. No others yet actually named on that date. 21C125 first noted working on the Eastern Section, 15/3, and 117 (on loan) the previous week. |
SLS/194605 |
26/03/1946 |
Surbiton |
903 (STL) painted green was noted on the 5.37 p.m. ex Basingstoke on 26/3. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
Locomotives Miscellany |
More W.D. 2-8-0's appear to be allocated to B.A.; many of these engines were lately standing about in the Dover areas. 'Schools' 907 'Dulwich,' 917 'Ardingly,' 934 'St. Lawrence' are light green. 'Demob.' specials are still running frequently from Folkestone, etc., to Guildford via Tonbridge and Redhill, worked to the latter by locos, carrying Dover spare duty Nos, 462-3, but actually the engines are often B.A. or AFD. 4-4-0's. They return light from Redhill it not otherwise required. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
\"West Country\" Namings |
21C107 is 'Wadebridge,' 21C108 'Padstow' (correcting any previous reports). The name 'Bodmin' may not actually be on 21C110 yet. Names on 21C101-4, 21C106-9, 21C112 officially confirmed 14/3/46. No others yet actually named on that date. 21C125 first noted working on the Eastern Section, 15/3, and 117 (on loan) the previous week. |
SLS/194605 |
07/03/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. |
SLS/194904 |
28/04/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. |
SLS/195106 |
12/05/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. |
SLS/195107 |
26/11/1961 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Yard: D5006, D6530/63, 15211, 30065, 30120, 30782, 32349, 34072, 34103, 35006, 41275. Erecting Shop: D3460/2, D5003/11, 3798, 4616/26, 7782, 9629, 30057, 30531, 31808, 32343, 33023/33/40, 34007/15/6/33/57/94, 34110, 35008/9/10/8, 41206/16/70, 41301/24, 73018/20, 73113, 75079, 76059, 80154, 92239. Scrap Yard: 30023/59, 30247, 30584, 30858/9, 30918 intact. |
SLS/196201 |
07/07/1968 |
Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks |
Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. |
SLS/196810 |