|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 18/06/1953 | 31/07/1953 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 30/11/1954 | 24/12/1954 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 01/06/1956 | 14/07/1956 | 44 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 07/11/1957 | 30/11/1957 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 11/03/1959 | 18/04/1959 | 39 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 06/05/1960 | 04/06/1960 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 23/02/1962 | 31/03/1962 | 37 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 19/01/1966 | 31/01/1966 | 13 days | Non Classified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/04/1951 | Eastleigh Works | Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. | SLS/195106 |
12/05/1951 | Eastleigh Works | In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. | SLS/195107 |
18/02/1962 | Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: D2250, D6500/3/7, 15212, 30055, 30781, 30864, 33020, 34002/52, Erecting Shop: D3042, D3271, D3471, D5012/4, D6506/63, L.S.W.R. 120, 4694, 9667, 30045, 30515/42, 30838/43, 30955, 31795/8, 32646, 33039, 34011/18/24/66/72, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76005/19/63, 80010/65/6, 80139/41/51, 92239. Scrap Road: 30059, 30475/6, 30905, 31723. | SLS/196204 |
25/02/1962 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1945 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 21C102 Built at Brighton Works Tender fitted: LP Series 1 |
||
11/07/1945 | Naming | Named 'SALISBURY' by Councillor A Courtney (Mayor) at Salisbury | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
08/01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34002 | ||
18/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/06/1953. Dep: 31/07/1953. | ||
30/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/11/1954. Dep: 24/12/1954. | ||
03/12/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3303 | ||
01/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1956. Dep: 14/07/1956. | ||
07/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/11/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957. | ||
11/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/03/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959. | ||
06/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/05/1960. Dep: 04/06/1960. | ||
23/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1962. Dep: 31/03/1962. | ||
06/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) | ||
18/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
19/01/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 19/01/1966. Dep: 31/01/1966. | ||
02/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34002 | ||
10/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |