Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3607 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17013 Week
» 70029 Month
» 189556 Year
» 3216409 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3461 |
24/06/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08376 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/06/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
24/06/1957 |
Power Unit IH3841 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3461 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08376 |
|
|
17/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08376 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
14/04/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|