Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1703 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19506 Week
» 72522 Month
» 192049 Year
» 3218902 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D345 |
17/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40145 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3091/D641 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
17/05/1961 to Neville Hill (55H) |
Withdrawn |
10/06/1983 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs , 24 dys |
Information |
Derailment damage |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
17/05/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/09/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
12/10/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
09/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
24/09/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
12/10/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/1978 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D345 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3091 Allocated to Neville Hill (55H) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
24/09/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40145 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
12/10/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
03/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/06/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40145 |
|
|