30/11/1946 |
General |
East Kent Railway No. 5 (L.S.W.R. Adams 4-4-2T), which was recently returned to the S.R., has not been cut up, as was recently reported elsewhere. lt has heen overhauled and has reappeared as No. 3488. (The old L.S.W.R. number being 0488). It is presiunably a third engine for the Lyme Regis branch in company with Nos, 3125 and 3520 |
SLS/194701 |
31/07/1949 |
Adams 4-4-2T\'s |
Of the three surviving Adams 4-4-2T's, No. 30584 (ex 3520) is repainted, with 'British Railways' on the tank sides, No. 30582 (ex 3125) is painted black and fully lined, without lettering, •whilst No. 3488 (ex E.K.R. No. 5) is still running in 'Southern' style. No. 3488 now carries a Drummond boiler, probably off No. 3520, while Nos. 30582/84 both cary the Adams pattern again. No. 30584 has a tall dome and No. 30582, the smaller variety. The three locomotives normally work a week at a time in turn on the Lyme Regis branch, the other two standing 'spare' at Exmouth Junction shed. The change-over is carried out on Saturdays, and an interesting working at present (during the summer service) is that the relieving locomotive runs 'light' to Seaton, working the 10.10 a.m. from Seaton to Seaton Junction-all through coaches to Waterloo-later attaching this train to the rear of the 9.10 a.m. Exmouth-Waterloo. The locomotive then runs 'light' to Axminster, where it stands as relief to the one finishing its week's spell of duty; the actual change-over taking place later in the day. |
SLS/194908 |
12/05/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. |
SLS/195107 |
25/02/1961 |
Lyme Regis MPD |
41309 replaced 30583 on Saturday, 25th February-the latter returning to Exmouth Junction where it joined 30582; 30584 has been returned to Eastleigh. The LMS type (or standard) 2-6-2Ts have been passed for regular use on the branch and since January, double-heading has become permissible. |
SLS/196103 |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
26/11/1961 |
Eastleigh Works (Scrap Yard) |
Works Yard: D5006, D6530/63, 15211, 30065, 30120, 30782, 32349, 34072, 34103, 35006, 41275. Erecting Shop: D3460/2, D5003/11, 3798, 4616/26, 7782, 9629, 30057, 30531, 31808, 32343, 33023/33/40, 34007/15/6/33/57/94, 34110, 35008/9/10/8, 41206/16/70, 41301/24, 73018/20, 73113, 75079, 76059, 80154, 92239. Scrap Yard: 30023/59, 30247, 30584, 30858/9, 30918 intact. |
SLS/196201 |