30/11/1946 |
General |
East Kent Railway No. 5 (L.S.W.R. Adams 4-4-2T), which was recently returned to the S.R., has not been cut up, as was recently reported elsewhere. lt has heen overhauled and has reappeared as No. 3488. (The old L.S.W.R. number being 0488). It is presiunably a third engine for the Lyme Regis branch in company with Nos, 3125 and 3520 |
SLS/194701 |
31/07/1949 |
Adams 4-4-2T\'s |
Of the three surviving Adams 4-4-2T's, No. 30584 (ex 3520) is repainted, with 'British Railways' on the tank sides, No. 30582 (ex 3125) is painted black and fully lined, without lettering, •whilst No. 3488 (ex E.K.R. No. 5) is still running in 'Southern' style. No. 3488 now carries a Drummond boiler, probably off No. 3520, while Nos. 30582/84 both cary the Adams pattern again. No. 30584 has a tall dome and No. 30582, the smaller variety. The three locomotives normally work a week at a time in turn on the Lyme Regis branch, the other two standing 'spare' at Exmouth Junction shed. The change-over is carried out on Saturdays, and an interesting working at present (during the summer service) is that the relieving locomotive runs 'light' to Seaton, working the 10.10 a.m. from Seaton to Seaton Junction-all through coaches to Waterloo-later attaching this train to the rear of the 9.10 a.m. Exmouth-Waterloo. The locomotive then runs 'light' to Axminster, where it stands as relief to the one finishing its week's spell of duty; the actual change-over taking place later in the day. |
SLS/194908 |
31/10/1949 |
Adams 4-4-2T\'s |
No. 3488 (E.K. No. 5) has now been painted black and fully lined, with crest, and re-numbered 30583, so all three are now re-numbered. |
SLS/194912 |
07/09/1955 |
Eastleigh Works |
Although two of the N15x class have been condemned, it is interesting to observe that Nos. 32327/31/32 are under repair. Also in the erecting shop were 4-4-2T 30583, 0-4-4T 30058/125/668, 2-6-4T 42102/3, as well as numerous 'Schools', 'Arthurs' & 'Pacifics'. The Redbridge C14, No. 77, was in the yard. At the shed, L.S.W. 563 with 0-6-OT 32606 made an unusual combination. One Adams goods, 30566, was noted, and 2-6-2T 41305, but the larger class (82xxx) was not represented. Apart from diesels 13012 an 15231, only normal types were on view, several T9's and various classes of L.S.W. 4-6-0, and of course Bulleid 'Pacifics'. |
SLS/195510 |
25/02/1961 |
Lyme Regis MPD |
41309 replaced 30583 on Saturday, 25th February-the latter returning to Exmouth Junction where it joined 30582; 30584 has been returned to Eastleigh. The LMS type (or standard) 2-6-2Ts have been passed for regular use on the branch and since January, double-heading has become permissible. |
SLS/196103 |
11/04/1961 |
Lyme Regis branch |
30583 replaced 41299 on 4th April till end of week. |
SLS/196106 |