Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 669 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18472 Week
» 71488 Month
» 191015 Year
» 3217868 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3430 |
08/04/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08360 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/04/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/04/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3430 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08360 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
24/01/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08360 from Margam (MG) |
|
|
03/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|