Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 865 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6649 Week
» 28038 Month
» 147565 Year
» 3174418 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3429 |
28/03/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08359 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 12/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 07/1975 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/03/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3429 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
12/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08359 |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
22/01/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08359 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|