Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 861 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14904 Week
» 79858 Month
» 282522 Year
» 3309375 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3426 |
26/03/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08356 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/03/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/03/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3426 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (16B) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
18/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
24/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (SY) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08356 |
|
|
01/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08356 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
24/12/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|