Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 894 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14300 Week
» 67316 Month
» 186843 Year
» 3213696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3424 |
05/02/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08354 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/02/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/02/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3424 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08354 |
|
|
10/07/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08354 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
17/04/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|