Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 898 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18701 Week
» 71717 Month
» 191244 Year
» 3218097 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3417 |
28/02/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08347 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/02/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/02/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3417 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
29/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08347 |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (GM) |
|
|
01/11/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08347 from Grangemouth (GM) |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow |
|
|