Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 296 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18099 Week
» 71115 Month
» 190642 Year
» 3217495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3416 |
21/02/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08346 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/02/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/02/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3416 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
02/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
27/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08346 |
|
|
01/12/1980 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (DT) |
|
|
01/03/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08346 from Dunfermline Townhill (DT) |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow |
|
|