Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3411 |
22/01/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08341 |
04/1975 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/01/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/01/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3411 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yoker (65G) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08341 |
|
|
01/11/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08341 from Dunfermline Townhill (DT) |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow |
|
|