Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3407 |
on |
01/08/1956 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1958 |
Cardiff East Dock MPD |
Following the arrival of further diesel shunters (D3404/5/6/7, D3420/1/2/3/4) most of the remaining steam stock has been transferred to Radyr including the entire batch of 34XX panniers (3400-9). All the freight engines from Cathays have also been tranferred to Radyr as Cathays is being rebuilt as a diesel car depot. Presumably Cathays will close as a steam shed when all passenger workings become diesel car operated. |
SLS/195803 |
09/08/1958 |
Barry MPD |
The last G.W.R.-designed steam locomotives to be built (3400-9) are all in store, together with 6751/3/8. |
SLS/195810 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/08/1956 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3407 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2582 Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
05/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3407 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|