Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 286 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18089 Week
» 71105 Month
» 190632 Year
» 3217485 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3406 |
on |
31/05/1956 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/05/1956 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
16/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
m/e |
31/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1958 |
Cardiff East Dock MPD |
Following the arrival of further diesel shunters (D3404/5/6/7, D3420/1/2/3/4) most of the remaining steam stock has been transferred to Radyr including the entire batch of 34XX panniers (3400-9). All the freight engines from Cathays have also been tranferred to Radyr as Cathays is being rebuilt as a diesel car depot. Presumably Cathays will close as a steam shed when all passenger workings become diesel car operated. |
SLS/195803 |
09/08/1958 |
Barry MPD |
The last G.W.R.-designed steam locomotives to be built (3400-9) are all in store, together with 6751/3/8. |
SLS/195810 |
24/01/1959 |
Western Region panniers |
The batch of 34XX panniers ex-store at Barry are now at Radyr except 3400(84G), and 3405/6 88C. They have replaced 4601/10/6/26/30/4/72/86 which have been modified for work on the S.R. and are now re-allocated to Dover and Folkestone. |
SLS/195903 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3406 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2581 Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
06/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3406 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|