Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3512 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34162 Week
» 132807 Month
» 335471 Year
» 3362324 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3395 |
01/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08325 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/11/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/11/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3395 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08325 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
26/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
08/07/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08325 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
02/11/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|