Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 894 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14300 Week
» 67316 Month
» 186843 Year
» 3213696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3393 |
25/10/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08323 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/10/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/10/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3393 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08323 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) |
|
|
31/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/07/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08323 from Selhurst (SU) |
|
|
02/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|