Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3392 |
18/10/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08322 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3392 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08322 |
|
|
22/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
18/09/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08322 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
30/09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|