Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 341 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18144 Week
» 71160 Month
» 190687 Year
» 3217540 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3389 |
11/10/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08319 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/10/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/10/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3389 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
30/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (HN) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08319 |
|
|
25/04/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08319 from Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J R Adams: Glasgow |
|
|