Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 551 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18354 Week
» 71370 Month
» 190897 Year
» 3217750 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3375 |
22/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08305 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3375 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
14/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Knottingley (55G) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08305 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
30/10/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08305 from Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
16/02/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|