Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3868 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13442 Week
» 78396 Month
» 281060 Year
» 3307913 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3373 |
15/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08303 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/08/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3373 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08303 |
|
|
20/12/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (DY) |
|
|
31/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08303 from Derby (DY) |
|
|
03/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|