Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1787 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15193 Week
» 68209 Month
» 187736 Year
» 3214589 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3372 |
10/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08302 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 11/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/08/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3372 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08302 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
29/06/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08302 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
02/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|