Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2483 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15889 Week
» 68905 Month
» 188432 Year
» 3215285 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3370 |
02/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08300 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/08/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3370 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
05/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
25/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08300 |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BC) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CH) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (AN) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
17/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08300 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|
07/04/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|