Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2299 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15705 Week
» 68721 Month
» 188248 Year
» 3215101 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3367 |
11/07/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08297 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/07/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3367 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08297 |
|
|
16/08/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08297 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
27/02/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|