Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3756 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17162 Week
» 70178 Month
» 189705 Year
» 3216558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13363 |
24/05/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3363 |
25/01/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08293 |
06/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/05/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/05/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13363 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
25/01/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3363 |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
27/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08293 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
24/12/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08293 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
10/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|