Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 395 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18198 Week
» 71214 Month
» 190741 Year
» 3217594 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3361 |
05/07/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08291 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/07/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/07/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3361 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (DG) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08291 |
|
|
04/01/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08291 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|
24/12/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|