Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1716 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7500 Week
» 28889 Month
» 148416 Year
» 3175269 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3358 |
28/06/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08288 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
28/06/1957 to Llanelli (87F) |
Withdrawn |
21/01/1983 off Swindon (SW) |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/06/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Under Restoration/Overhaul |
Status Date |
02/12/2020 |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3358 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08288 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
21/01/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08288 from Swindon (SW) |
|
|