Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 324 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18127 Week
» 71143 Month
» 190670 Year
» 3217523 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13355 |
19/06/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3355 |
01/12/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08285 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/06/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13355 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
01/12/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3355 |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
29/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08285 |
|
|
12/09/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08285 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
12/11/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|