Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2623 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16029 Week
» 69045 Month
» 188572 Year
» 3215425 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13348 |
03/05/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3348 |
03/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08278 |
10/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/05/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/05/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13348 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
03/09/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3348 |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
10/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08278 |
|
|
21/06/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08278 from Hamilton (West) (HN) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|