Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2574 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15980 Week
» 68996 Month
» 188523 Year
» 3215376 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13347 |
03/05/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3347 |
31/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08277 |
04/12/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/05/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/05/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13347 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
31/07/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3347 |
|
|
02/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
04/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08277 |
|
|
22/11/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08277 from Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
30/07/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|