Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1089 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18892 Week
» 71908 Month
» 191435 Year
» 3218288 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13346 |
26/04/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3346 |
06/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08276 |
12/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/04/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13346 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
06/07/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3346 |
|
|
11/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08276 |
|
|
21/06/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08276 from Dundee West (DE) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|