Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 69 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17872 Week
» 70888 Month
» 190415 Year
» 3217268 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13345 |
26/04/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3345 |
25/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08275 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/04/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13345 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
25/04/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3345 |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
30/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08275 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
22/02/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08275 from Toton (TO) |
|
|
14/07/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|