Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3094 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16500 Week
» 69516 Month
» 189043 Year
» 3215896 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13338 |
23/03/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3338 |
02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08268 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/03/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/03/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13338 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
02/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3338 |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
07/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08268 |
|
|
23/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (DN) |
|
|
14/07/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08268 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
08/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|