Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2018 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15424 Week
» 68440 Month
» 187967 Year
» 3214820 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13334 |
21/01/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3334 |
24/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08264 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/01/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13334 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3334 |
|
|
10/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08264 |
|
|
08/07/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08264 from Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
24/11/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|