Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1426 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19229 Week
» 72245 Month
» 191772 Year
» 3218625 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3329 |
m/e |
07/1899 |
Great Western Railway (1912) |
3291 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Great Western Railway (90xx) |
9091 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
07/1899 |
Thames |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Duke |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
113 |
Works Number |
1699 |
To Service |
During 07/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/02/1949 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1899 |
MCH |
|
Machynlleth |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
TYS |
|
Tyseley |
4w/e |
21/02/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/02/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TYS |
Tyseley |
4w/e |
21/02/1948 |
WDN |
MCH |
Machynlleth |
m/e |
28/02/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1913 |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
03/1915 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
06/1935 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3329, name: Thames Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1699 Diagram BR4 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3291 |
|
|
01/1913 |
Modification |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
06/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9091 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
21/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
01/02/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9091 |
|
|